California Central District Court
Judge:Karen E Scott
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00845
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 2:13 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 8:25-cv-00845 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Fri 05/02 8:20 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Leland Dudek. (Attorney Angela Gail Thornton-Millard added to party Leland Dudek (pty:dft))(Thornton-Millard, Angela)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Mon 04/28 12:07 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Claudio Corona. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 04/24 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/23 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Claudio Corona, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/23 1:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Claudio Corona. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39565932 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Claudio Corona. (Attorney Lawrence D. Rohlfing added to party Claudio Corona(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
Related: [-]