Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Claria Horn Boom
Case #: 3:25-cv-00232
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 25-CI-002119
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 5:10 PM EDT
Defendant
Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By
Blythe McGregor
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Katharine C. Weber
Jackson Lewis Pc - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Grant
Represented By
Soha T. Saiyed
Saiyed Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 1:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Weber, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 04/24 10:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)) identifying Corporate Parent Eurofins Scientific S.E., Other Affiliate Eurofins Food Testing LUX Holding SARL, Other Affiliate Eurofins Food Testing US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Eurofins International Holdings LUX SARL for Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc. ; filed by Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Weber, Katharine)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 04/24 10:48 AM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Weber, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 notice Deficiency Wed 04/23 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency Katharine C. Weber re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement for Defendant. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/30/2025. (DeW)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 4:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel of Record/parties re1 Notice of Removal. (DeW)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Wed 04/23 4:06 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DeW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-002119, filed by Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4235156.) Notice to counsel: Pursuant to LR 81.1(a), the removing party must electronically file any portion of the state court record it considers relevant to the removed action that the removing party did not file at the time of removal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Pursuant to LR 81.1(b), any motion that remains pending in state court at the time of removal that the movant wishes the District Court to rule upon must be refiled in the District Court case within 14 days after removal. (DeW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B -Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kristin Taplick,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Cover Sheet