Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:25-cv-11171
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Case in other court:Lapeer County Circuit Court, 25-058247-NO
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 5:10 PM EDT
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. d/b/a WALMART SUPERCENTER
Represented By
Nicole M. Wright
Zausmer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Madaline Foster


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 notice Appearance Thu 04/24 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Keyes on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Keyes, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 04/24 9:07 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Walmart, Inc. d/b/a WALMART SUPERCENTER identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Walmart, Inc. d/b/a WALMART SUPERCENTER. (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 04/24 11:36 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. d/b/a WALMART SUPERCENTER from Lapeer County Circuit Court, case number 25-058247-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10209872 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Wright, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint.,
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Service of Process Transmittal,
Att: 4 Exhibit C, Stipulated Order Extending the Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, Dated April 23, 2025.,
Att: 5 Exhibit D. Correspondence to Plaintiffs Attorney Capping Damages, Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages, Dated April 10, 2025.,
Att: 6 Exhibit E, Plaintiffs Email Declining to Cap Damages, Dated April 17, 2025.