Oregon District Court
Judge:Jeff Armistead
Case #: 2:25-cv-00665
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 order 5 - Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order 2254 & 2241 Fri 04/25 9:48 AM
Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 22542 on respondent. ORDER: Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 3) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Answer is due by 6/24/2025. Signed on 4/25/2025 by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. **13 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Ingram, Prisoner ID: 18031884) (gd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Acceptance and Acknowledgement,
Att: 2 2254 Petition
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT Fri 04/25 9:28 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Ingrams Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis1 is GRANTED. The petition may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 4/25/2025 by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Ingram, Prisoner ID: 18031884) (gd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Wed 04/23 1:03 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Nicholas Ingram, Prisoner ID: 18031884) (jw)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 04/23 12:59 PM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Nicholas Ingram. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nicholas Ingram, Prisoner ID: 18031884) (jw)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 Wed 04/23 12:57 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) (IFP Submitted) . Filed by Nicholas Ingram against Jamie Miller. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nicholas Ingram, Prisoner ID: 18031884) (jw)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Wed 04/23 12:54 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Nicholas Ingram. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Nicholas Ingram, Prisoner ID: 18031884) (jw)
Related: [-]