Barnhart v. Commissioner of Social Security
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Shanlyn AS Park |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00166 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/1/2025. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Barnhart shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on May 2, 2025. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Thornton-Millard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Thornton-Millard, Angela) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Dana A. Barbata on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Barbata, Dana) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Social Security Case Service
Wed 04/23 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Social Security Case Service: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405 (g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System (CM/ECF) notifying the appropriate Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorneys Office of the filing of this case. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Barnhart has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 23, 2025. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Jason Barnhart(eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Jason Barnhart. (eta) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Review of Final Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security - filed by Jason Barnhart.(eta) |