Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nicholas W Whittenburg
Case #: 1:25-bk-11004
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
6221 Shallowford Rd Ste 102
Chattanooga, TN 37421-1972
Represented By
W. Thomas Bible, Jr.
Law Office Of W. Thomas Bible, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Sunday, May 11, 2025
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 05/12 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 05/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 44 Exparte Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time to Set Hearing (Related Doc43 ). The order is approved as submitted except that the court reserves its right to reconsider whether notice has been sufficient at the time of the hearing based on the circumstances in this case. (cfy)
Saturday, May 10, 2025
45 45 2 pgs misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 05/10 1:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Creditor Basket Medical, PLLC. (Ramsey, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
44 44 order Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time Fri 05/09 12:44 PM
Exparte Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time to Set Hearing Related [+]. The order is approved as submitted except that the court reserves its right to reconsider whether notice has been sufficient at the time of the hearing based on the circumstances in this case. (cfy)
Related: [-] 43
Thursday, May 08, 2025
43 43 motion Extend or Shorten Time Thu 05/08 1:39 PM
Motion to Shorten Time To Hear Motion to Decline Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
42 42 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 05/08 1:36 PM
Miscellaneous Motion to Decline Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Hearing scheduled 5/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
41 41 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/08 10:57 AM
Certificate of Service Interim Order (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (II) Granting Adequate Protection and (III) Notice of Final Hearing and Opportunity to Object Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Related [+]. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-] 29 Order (Generic)
Sunday, May 04, 2025
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 05/05 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order and Notice of Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference to Set Hearing (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center). Status Conference Hearing scheduled 6/12/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. A Status Conference Report shall be filed by Thursday, May 29, 2025. (cfy)
Friday, May 02, 2025
39 39 order Set Hearing Fri 05/02 3:29 PM
Order and Notice of Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference to Set Hearing Related [+]. Status Conference Hearing scheduled 6/12/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. A Status Conference Report shall be filed by Thursday, May 29, 2025. (cfy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
38 38 misc Tax Return/Documents Tue 04/29 5:41 PM
Tax Return/Documents for the Year 2024 Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
37 37 court Document Tue 04/29 5:39 PM
Notice of Filing Financial Statements Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Profit and Loss 2024
Att: 2 Profit and Loss YTD 2025
Att: 3 Statement of Cash Flow 2024
Att: 4 Statement of Cash Flow 2025 YTD
Sunday, April 27, 2025
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/28 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Granting Motion Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages and Salaries and Other Employee Obligations. (Related Doc11 ) (cam)
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/28 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Granting Motion to Approve Pre-Confirmation Payment of Escrow Funds to the Subchapter V Trustee in the amount of $1,000.00 per month on or before the last day of each month, beginning April 30, 2025, and terminating upon the entry of an Order confirming a Plan. (Related Doc9 ) (cam)
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/28 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Granting Motion Authorizing Continued Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, and Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms and Checks. (Related Doc6 ) (cam)
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/28 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Interim Order (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (II) Granting Adequate Protection and (III) Notice of Final Hearing and Opportunity to Object. A final hearing on the Motion is hereby set for June 12, 2025, at 9 AM EST. Debtor shall mail notice to interested parties within five (5) business days after entry of this Order. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center). (cam)
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/28 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Granting Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b). (Related Doc10 ) (cam)
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/28 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone: 866-808-0545, passcode 6401636 (Ch 11 cases in Chattanooga / Winchester). Proof of Claim due by 7/2/2025. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Saturday, April 26, 2025
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Sun 04/27 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Granting Motion for Ex Parte Relief Re: Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions. (Related Doc12 ) (cam)
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 04/25 4:11 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (II) Granting Adequate Protection and (III) Notice of Final Hearing and Opportunity to Object. A final hearing on the Motion is hereby set for June 12, 2025, at 9 AM EST. Debtor shall mail notice to interested parties within five (5) business days after entry of this Order. Related [+]. (cam)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Related [+]. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Motion for Continuation of Utility Service
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Fri 04/25 1:55 PM
Order Granting Motion Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages and Salaries and Other Employee Obligations. Related [+] (cam)
Related: [-] 11
26 26 order Continuation of Utility Service Fri 04/25 1:53 PM
Order Granting Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b). Related [+] (cam)
Related: [-] 10
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Fri 04/25 1:48 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Pre-Confirmation Payment of Escrow Funds to the Subchapter V Trustee in the amount of $1,000.00 per month on or before the last day of each month, beginning April 30, 2025, and terminating upon the entry of an Order confirming a Plan. Related [+] (cam)
Related: [-] 9
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Fri 04/25 1:26 PM
Order Granting Motion Authorizing Continued Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, and Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Business Forms and Checks. Related [+] (cam)
Related: [-] 6
23 23 court Hearing Held (BK) Fri 04/25 11:38 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 11 Miscellaneous Motion filed by DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
22 22 court Hearing Held (BK) Fri 04/25 11:37 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
21 21 court Hearing Held (BK) Fri 04/25 11:37 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 9 Miscellaneous Motion filed by DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
20 20 court Hearing Held/Continued (BK) Fri 04/25 11:37 AM
Hearing Held/Continued Related [+] Motion granted on an interim basis; final hearing scheduled 06/12/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. Replacement order to be submitted. (sal)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
19 19 court Hearing Held (BK) Fri 04/25 11:36 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 6 Miscellaneous Motion filed by DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Thu 04/24 5:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone: 866-808-0545, passcode 6401636 (Ch 11 cases in Chattanooga / Winchester). Proof of Claim due by 7/2/2025. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Thu 04/24 5:54 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Amanda Stofan . Amanda M Stofan added to the case.. Filed by David Holesinger on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
16 16 2 pgs order Order Acting on Motion for Ex Parte Relief Thu 04/24 12:10 PM
Order Granting Motion for Ex Parte Relief Re: Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions. Related [+] (cam)
Related: [-] 12
15 15 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/24 8:30 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:25-bk-11004] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24928886. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 5 pgs motion Employ Wed 04/23 6:54 PM
Application to Employ W. Thomas Bible, Jr. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Objections due by 05/14/2025. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 Matrix
13 13 court Document Wed 04/23 6:47 PM
Company Profile Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Ex Parte Relief Wed 04/23 6:41 PM
Motion for Ex Parte Relief Re: EMERGENCY HEARING ON FIRST DAY MOTIONS Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 04/23 6:33 PM
Miscellaneous Motion FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES AND SALARIES AND OTHER EMPLOYEE OBLIGATIONS Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Hearing scheduled 4/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
10 10 motion Continuation of Utility Service Wed 04/23 6:25 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) (1) TO DETERMINE APPROPRIATE AMOUNT OF ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OF PAYMENT FOR UTILITIES; (2) PROHIBIT UTILITY PROVIDERS FROM ALTERING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICE; AND (3) ALLOW PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION UTILITY BILLS Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Hearing scheduled 4/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 04/23 6:16 PM
Miscellaneous Motion to Escrow Funds for Subchapter V Trustee Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Hearing scheduled 4/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
8 8 court Document Wed 04/23 6:06 PM
Proposed Order Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Use Cash Collateral Wed 04/23 6:01 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral AND GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Hearing scheduled 4/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Matrix
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 04/23 5:47 PM
Miscellaneous Motion FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE AND USE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center Hearing scheduled 4/25/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
5 5 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 04/23 4:28 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 04/23 4:27 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN) Wed 04/23 4:26 PM
Debtor Requests to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement Regarding Payment Advices Wed 04/23 4:26 PM
Statement Regarding Payment Advices or Other Evidence of Payment. Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of Debtor DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 04/23 4:25 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by W. Thomas Bible Jr. on behalf of DC Ventures, PLLC d/b/a Bryn Medical Center. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/20/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 05/23/2025 (Bible, W.)
Related: [-]