New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:25-cv-02230
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Case in other court:Supreme Court of the State of New York Suffolk Cou, 609619/2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 8:05 AM EDT
Defendant
David Lee Heller
Represented By
Ariel Michael Furman
Furman Kornfeld & Brennan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ellen Heller
Represented By
Ariel Michael Furman
Furman Kornfeld & Brennan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy A. Blum
Represented By
Daniel E. Sully
Of Counsel To Fattore Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ilene G. Fattore
Represented By
Daniel E. Sully
Of Counsel To Fattore Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 05/09 1:10 PM
Electronic ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The 5/13/25 Initial Conference before Magistrate Judge Locke is adjourned without date. The issue of reassignment will be addressed in a separate Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/9/2025. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 05/08 2:23 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference Transfer To Pending Action by Wendy A. Blum, Ilene G. Fattore. (Fattore, Raffaello)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 9:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raffaello Fattore on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Fattore, Raffaello)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 05/06 1:09 PM
Electronic ORDER granting8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent of the parties, the 5/7/25 Initial Conference is adjourned to 5/13/25 at 10:15 in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/6/2025. (KDW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 1 pgs motion Adjourn Conference Thu 05/01 6:06 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by David Lee Heller, Ellen Heller. (Kornfeld, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Mon 04/28 10:13 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service by David Lee Heller, Ellen Heller (Furman, Ariel)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 7:19 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Ab Initial Conference is set for 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order and attachments on Plaintiff and electronically file proof of service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/28/2025. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Wed 04/23 11:23 AM
Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (LJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 04/23 11:19 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/23 10:10 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (LJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/23/2025) Additional Corrections
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/23 9:27 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by David Lee Heller (Furman, Ariel)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/23 11:19 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Wed 04/23 11:27 AM
Daniel E. Sully - This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of the State of New York Suffolk County, case number 609619/2025. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18977197) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Furman, Ariel) Modified on 4/23/2025 (LJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Verified Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal
NOTICE: Missing Civil Cover Sheet. The clerk's office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. The form is available at:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/js-44-civil-cover-sheet] Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]