District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Christopher R Cooper
Case #: 1:25-cv-01263
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:34 AM EDT
Defendant
PAMELA J. BONDI
Defendant
Todd Blanche
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff
AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Brian D. Netter
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 misc Transcript Wed 04/30 11:51 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on April 24, 2025; Page Numbers: 1-10. Date of Issuance:April 30, 2025. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/21/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2025.(Moreira, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Fri 04/25 1:20 PM
RESPONSE re10 Notice (Other) Regarding Status of Filing filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION. (Netter, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pooja Boisture on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION (Boisture, Pooja)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 11:47 AM
NOTICE Regarding Status of Funds by TODD BLANCHE, PAMELA J. BONDI, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Warden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew I. Warden on behalf of TODD BLANCHE, PAMELA J. BONDI, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Warden, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Coogle on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION (Coogle, Christine)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jodie T. Morse on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION (Morse, Jodie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 9:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave for Christine L. Coogle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) .[LINK:Click for instructions] . Counsel is directed to the comment to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) providing that "as a general matter, attorneys who engage in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia and who file papers in this Court should be a member of the Bar of this Court and the District of Columbia Bar." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/25/2025. (lccrc2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 9:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave for Pooja A. Boisture to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) .[LINK:Click for instructions] . Counsel is directed to the comment to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) providing that "as a general matter, attorneys who engage in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia and who file papers in this Court should be a member of the Bar of this Court and the District of Columbia Bar." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/25/2025. (lccrc2)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/25 5:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendants'10 Notice and Plaintiff's12 Response, the Court will consider Plaintiff's4 Motion on the timetable set forth in Local Civil Rule 65.1. Defendants' opposition shall be due May 2, 2025. Plaintiff shall file any reply by May 7, 2025. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the Motion on May 12, 2025, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper (in person). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/25/2025. (lccrc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 2:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pooja A. Boisture, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11641999. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION.(Netter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 2:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christine L. Coogle, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11641828. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION.(Netter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Thu 04/24 11:50 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION.(Netter, Brian). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/24/2025 (zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 04/24 9:13 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/24 9:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmw)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/24 1:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to appear for a remote scheduling conference at 3:00 PM today, April 24, 2025, before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Zoom information will be provided separately. Plaintiff's counsel shall inform government counsel of the Court's order as soon as possible. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/24/2025. (lccrc2)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 04/24 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for video Status Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/24/2025. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 10:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Netter on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION (Netter, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 10:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11639874) filed by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION.(Netter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons