Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00166
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:34 AM EDT
Defendant
FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC
Represented By
KEITH L RICHARDSON
contact info
Plaintiff
SSC BOVEE COMPANY


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 misc Jurisdictional Statement Mon 04/28 1:23 PM
Jurisdictional Statement by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC (JOHNSON, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/28 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DANIEL KENNETH JOHNSON on behalf of FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC (JOHNSON, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 04/28 9:22 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(elp)
Related: [-] 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Jurisdictional Statement filed by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 04/28 4:37 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Notice to Counsel DANIEL KENNETH JOHNSON , The email address on the document does not match your email address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your email address via PACER.(elp) Modified on 4/28/2025 to add second NOD (elp). Notice of Deficiency
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC 6 Jurisdictional Statement filed by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC; The signature block does not include the email address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Jurisdictional Statement Fri 04/25 6:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC, Jurisdictional Statement by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC (JOHNSON, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 04/24 10:21 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]
Related: [-] 3 Answer to Complaint filed by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC; All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1. Notice of Deficiency (related document(s):1 Notice of Removal, filed by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC ); Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. No need to refile, for future reference only . (elp
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 9:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC.(RICHARDSON, KEITH)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Compel Stay Wed 04/23 8:48 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and , MOTION to Stay by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC filed by KEITH L RICHARDSON.(RICHARDSON, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subcontract
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 8:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against SSC BOVEE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4926756, $405 filed by FAIRWAY CONSTRUCTION CO INC All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (RICHARDSON, KEITH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet