Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:25-cv-02163
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Terminated:May 09, 2025

Debtor
United Express Cab, Co.

,
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:34 AM EDT
Appellant
Edward Heller
Represented By
Leslie Pineyro
Jones & Walden LLC
contact info
James Hugh Potts, II
James Hugh Potts Ii LLC
contact info
Appellee
Martha Kebede
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Setegne Woubshet
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Addisu Wordofa
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
United Group Captive Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
The Probate Estate of Fekade S. Haile
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Zewdu Teshome
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Mekren Tassew
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Nyala Investment, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Admasse Kebede
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Jifar A. Jebel
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Saba Gebrekidan
3231 Liberty Court
Conyers, GA 30094
Appellee
Tafesse Belachew
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Kirubel Assefa
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Tafara W. Agegnehou
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
Nima Adem
Represented By
Jeffrey Andrew Reynolds
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Michael Pugh
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info
Aaron Marcus Kappler
Thompson, O'Brien, Kappler & Nasuti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 05/09 11:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING Cross-Appellant Edward Heller's (2) Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court hereby CONSOLIDATES In re: United Express Cab, Co., Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2073-SEG, with In re: United Express Cab, Co., Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2163-SEG. The cases shall be consolidated under Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2073-SEG. The parties are DIRECTED to make any filings related to the consolidated cases on the docket of Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2073-SEG. The Clerk is DIRECTED to (1) file this order in both Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2073-SEG and Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2163-SEG; (2) transfer all documents associated with Docket Entry No. 1 in Civil Action No. 1:25-CV- 2163-SEG to Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2073-SEG; and (3) administratively close Civil Action No. 1:25-CV-2163-SEG. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/8/2025. Associated Cases: 1:25-cv-02073-SEG, 1:25-cv-02163-SEG(ane)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/09 11:15 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
2 2 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 05/07 1:10 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Appeals) by Edward Heller.(Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Wed 04/23 11:23 AM
Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 11-55928 pwb, ADV case#: 13-5069 Notice of Appeal filed 4/17/2025 from Order entered 4/03/2025 by Appellant Edward Heller, individually and as the Administrator of the Probate Estate of Patricia Heller. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. A63069417. filed by Edward Heller.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cross-Appeal doc 482,
Att: 2 Appealed Order doc 473,
Att: 3 Related Appeal doc 478,
Att: 4 Docket sheet