Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:25-cv-01304
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 11:01 PM EDT
Defendant
Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc.
909 St. Paul St.
Baltimore, MD 21202
Plaintiff
Carolyn Gale
On behalf of herself and all others similarly situated 1017 Susquehanna Avenue
Middle River, MD 21220
Represented By
Duane O King
The Law Office Of Duane O. King
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 12:05 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 11:58 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Carolyn Gale.(jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/23 3:48 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 38 pgs COMPLAINT against Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11925720.), filed by Carolyn Gale.(King, Duane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B