Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Clifton L Corker
Referred: Cynthia R Wyrick
Case #: 2:25-cv-00071
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:41 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corporations (A-Z)
Defendant
Chief Chad Mosley
Defendant
Chief Deputy Tony Allen
Defendant
City of Church Hill, Tennessee
Defendant
Hawkins County, Tennessee
Defendant
Jane and John Does 1-5
Defendant
Nurse Sarah
Defendant
Officer Blake Perry
Defendant
Sheriff Ronnie Lawson
Plaintiff
Daniel Baker
Represented By
Christopher David Rogers
Cdr Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 9:33 AM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on April 25, 2025. (SAC)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Fri 04/25 8:54 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5974601.) filed by Daniel Baker . (DCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 1:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5974601.) by Daniel Baker. (Hertz, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 04/24 1:40 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/24/2025. (DCB)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 04/24 1:39 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/24/2025. (DCB)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 04/24 1:38 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/24/2025. (DCB)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Thu 04/24 1:32 PM
Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 4/29/2025 . The Clerks Office is unable to issue your proposed summons for Defendants ABC Corporations (A-Z) and Jane and John Does 1-5 because the proposed summons does not include the defendants address. (DCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 1:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Chief Chad Mosley, Chief Deputy Tony Allen, City of Church Hill, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Nurse Sarah, Officer Blake Perry, Sheriff Ronnie Lawson. (DCB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Thu 04/24 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re Eric J Hertz. Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (DCB)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/24 1:15 PM
District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 8:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5973988.), filed by Daniel Baker.(Rogers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons (ABC Corporations A-Z),
Att: 3 Summons (Chief Deputy Allen),
Att: 4 Summons (Chief Chad Mosley),
Att: 5 Summons (City of Church Hill),
Att: 6 Summons (Deputy Blake Perry),
Att: 7 Summons (Hawkins County, Tennessee),
Att: 8 Summons (John and Jane Does 1-5),
Att: 9 Summons (Nurse Sarah),
Att: 10 Summons (Sheriff Ronnie Lawson)