Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Jerry Edwards, Jr
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:25-cv-00541
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 04/28 8:40 AM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2025. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against River Bend Detention Center with Jury Demand filed by Perrin Taylor.(crt,Bowman, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 04/23 4:45 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Perrin Taylor. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Complaint. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/21/2025. (crt,Bowman, A) Modified to assign document number on 4/23/2025 (Bowman, A)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sun 04/27 8:40 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]