Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:S Maurice Hicks, Jr
Referred: Mark L Hornsby
Case #: 5:25-cv-00539
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 04/28 8:42 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/28/2025. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 4:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Lee Cousin. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/21/2025.(crt,Bowman, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Eddie Kennedy filed by Ronnie Lee Cousin.(crt,Bowman, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/28 8:37 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]