Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00429
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 8:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Suzuki Motor Corporation
Plaintiff
Vision Works IP Corp.
Represented By
James Francis McDonough, III
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan R Miller
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Carey Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Lloyd Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Suzuki Motor Corporation. (mdj)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/24 1:52 PM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (mdj)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 04/24 1:55 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mdj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/23 9:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan R Miller on behalf of Vision Works IP Corp. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/23 9:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Vision Works IP Corp. (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/23 9:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Lloyd Hardt on behalf of Vision Works IP Corp. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 04/23 9:10 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 04/23 9:08 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Vision Works IP Corp. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 9:04 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Suzuki Motor Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10799900.), filed by Vision Works IP Corp..(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Proposed Summons