California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:25-bk-13353
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 28, 2025

Debtor
JS Wood Manufacturing Inc
8340 Dacosta St
Downey, CA 90240-3927
Represented By
Raymond Perez
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Elissa Miller (TR)
Greenspoon Marder, LLP 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 12:26 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/23 5:39 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-13353] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58328142. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/23 5:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by JS Wood Manufacturing Inc (Perez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/23 7:07 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Miller (TR), Elissa with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom - Miller: Meeting ID 527 194 1367, Passcode 5568077908, Phone 1 213 592 1813. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]