California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:25-bk-12585
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 29, 2025

Debtor
Teezey Manufacturing, Inc.
24910 Las Brisas Rd Ste 122
Murrieta, CA 92562-4035
Represented By
Evan L Smith
Evan L Smith Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Todd A. Frealy (TR)
3403 Tenth Street, Suite 709
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 12:26 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/23 2:11 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:6:25-bk-12585] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58326551. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Wed 04/23 5:20 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] All debtor's signatures must be a wet/holographic actual signature: Digital signatures are not acceptable. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 5/7/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) All debtor's signatures must be a wet/holographic actual signature due 5/7/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/7/2025. (MY)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Teezey Manufacturing, Inc.
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Wed 04/23 5:22 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/7/2025. (MY)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Teezey Manufacturing, Inc.
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/23 1:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Complete . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Teezey Manufacturing, Inc. (Smith, Evan) WARNING: Case is deficient for Debtor's federal Employer Identification Number (EIN) (Full EIN required for NonIndividuals) due 04/28/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for NonIndividual Debtors (Official Form 202) Declaration (Signed) due 04/28/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (Signed) [LBR 10071(a)] (LBR Form F10071) (Official Form 201) due 04/28/2025. All debtor's signatures must be a wet/holographic actual signature: Digital signatures are not acceptable. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 5/7/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) All debtor's signatures must be a wet/holographic actual signature due 5/7/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/7/2025. See docket entries 3-5 for corrective actions. Modified on 4/23/2025 (MY)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/23 2:41 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Frealy (TR), Todd A. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 11:00 AM via Zoom - Frealy: Meeting ID 339 282 2477, Passcode 8221171064, Phone 1 909 498 7848. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Wed 04/23 5:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (MY)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 5:25 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without debtor's "wet" holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER DEBTOR'S HOLOGRAPHIC SIGNATURES. Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. Related [+] (MY)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Teezey Manufacturing, Inc.
5 5 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/23 5:44 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incomplete TAX ID listed on the Petition PDF; Full number must be legible and not redacted. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO INDICATE THE COMPLETE TAX ID NUMBER BY FILING AN AMENDED OFFICIAL VOLUNTARY PETITION FORM 201 IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (MY)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Teezey Manufacturing, Inc.