Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:25-cv-01346
Nature of Suit152 Contract - Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause28:1345 Recovery of Debt to US
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 1:59 AM MST
Defendant
Johnna D Dee
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Vincent Michael Creta
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion to Seal Document Wed 04/30 8:25 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Seal Exhibit 6 of the Complaint. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 4/30/25. (MAP)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Errata Wed 04/30 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Errata Redacted Exhibit 6 to Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America..(Creta, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 6
6 6 motion Seal Document Wed 04/30 3:51 PM
MOTION to Seal Document MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT 6 OF THE COMPLAINT by United States of America.(Creta, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 8:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER RECOVERY ACTION: ORDERED that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is six (6) months from the date the case is at issue. If no dispositive motions have been timely filed, a status hearing shall be conducted six (6) months from the date the case is at issue, with a written joint status report due five (5) days prior to the scheduled status hearing. FURTHER ORDERED that if neither a dispositive motion nor a joint status report has been filed, the case shall be dismissed on the date set for status hearing pursuant to LRCiv 41.1. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order within 15 days of any appearance. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 4/23/25. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Johnna D Dee. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 misc New Case Opened Wed 04/23 11:25 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01346 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Wed 04/23 11:24 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by United States of America. (submitted by Vincent Creta) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (submitted by Vincent Creta)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Table of Exhibits and Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet