California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-03616
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Jay-Rama Corporation
Plaintiff
Theresa Brooke
840 West Central Avenue
Coolidge, AZ 85128
Represented By
Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Law Offices Of Peter Strojnik
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/25 9:37 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: It appears that the Court possesses only supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, and any other state law claim that plaintiff may have alleged, pursuant to theCourt's supplemental jurisdiction. The Court Orders that Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 12:00 PM on May 2, 2025. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may,without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/24 5:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Jay-Rama Corporation. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 04/24 4:15 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (mal)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/24 3:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/24 3:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/24 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 04/23 9:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/23 9:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/23 9:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 9:47 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39569964 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter)
Related: [-]