California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:25-mc-00008
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 textonly Text Only Notice (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/28 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District,1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Early. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/28 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/25 3:39 PM
Chester Bragado's NOTICE of Interested Parties (Miltner, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1 1 cmp MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District Wed 04/23 7:12 PM
MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-39569531 - Fee: $52, filed by Plaintiff Chester Bragado. (Attorney William L Miltner added to party Chester Bragado(pty:inre))(Miltner, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Chester Bragado,
Att: 2 Declaration of William Miltner,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service