Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00586
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:57 AM MST
Defendant
Noel Medina (1)
Represented By
William Michael Atkins
Atkins Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Vanessa Anne Kubota
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 3:37 AM MST
Friday, March 07, 2025
Arrest of Noel Medina on 3/7/2025. (AO) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Noel Medina. (AO) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
2 2 Document was filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 3/12/2025 (CEI) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: Initial Appearance as to Noel Medina held on 3/11/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. The Court finds that the Defendant qualifies for court-appointed counsel and appoints CJA William Michael Atkins for Defendant. Defense counsel confirms that the Defendant understands the nature of the charge(s) and waives a formal reading. Preliminary Hearing waived. The Court accepts the Defendant's waiver and finds that probable cause has been established. The Government is seeking detention. Detention Hearing submitted. The Court finds that the Defendant is a flight risk and is ordered detained pending trial. SPANISH Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Genevieve Ozark for AUSA Vanessa Kubota for the Government, CJA Attorney William Michael Atkins for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. SPANISH Interpreter Renata Yawn assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:28 PM to 2:36 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus.(SMF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Noel Medina: The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the Defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the Defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the Defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the Defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the Defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The Defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The Defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the Defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Alison S. Bachus on 3/11/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMF) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Noel Medina.(Atkins, William) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
8 8 ORDER granting7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Noel Medina (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 3/14/2025. (CSL) [2:25-mj-06082-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 INFORMATION - Felony/Petty Offense (Class B Misdemeanor) as to Noel Medina, Counts 1 and 2. (MRH)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Noel Medina. (MRH)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Noel Medina. (MRH)
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTE ORDER as to Noel Medina referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Alison S. Bachus to conduct plea and sentencing (Class B Misdemeanor). (MRH)
Related: [-]