California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01249
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (1)
Represented By
Christian A. Mesa
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Brendan Barber
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 4:17 AM PDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
Arrest of Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos.(gac) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos: Initial Appearance set for 3/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos held on 3/21/2025. Oral proffer confirmed. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos. Bond set as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (1) $25,000 PS secured by 2 FRA(1 related) and 10% cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/03/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Arraignment set for 4/17/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 3/21/2025 SBC 25-1:3:34-4:13). (Plaintiff Attorney Adrian Henderson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Brittany Sherron FD-S/A, Nora Stephens FD-S/). (aje) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
7 7 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (1) $25,000 PS secured by 2 FRA(1 related) and 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 3/21/2025. (ajs) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 3/21/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christian A. Mesa appearing for Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (Mesa, Christian)Attorney Christian A. Mesa added to party Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos(pty:dft) (exs). [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (Mesa, Christian)(axc1). [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brendan Barber appearing for USA. (Barber, Brendan)Attorney Brendan Barber added to party USA(pty:pla) (exs). [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos. Report prepared by: P. Aftimos. (Document applicable to USA, Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos.) (Aftimos, P.) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (DATE ONLY) as to Defendant Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos. On Court's own motion, Preliminary Hearing reset for 4/2/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (bas1) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos. Defense oral motion to continue hearing; granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 4/17/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 4/2/2025 VET 25 1:43-1:49). (Plaintiff Attorney Adrian Henderson, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Christian Mesa, FD). (bas1) [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
13 13 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Barber, Brendan) (axi). [3:25-mj-01323-VET]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 INFORMATION as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bas1)
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Arraignment on Information as to Julio Cesar Leon-Gallegos (1) Counts 1, 2 held on 4/17/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/23/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge James E. Simmons Jr. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 4/17/2025 VET 25 2:08-2:18). (Plaintiff Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Christian Mesa, FD). (bas1)
Related: [-]