Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00110
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 3:23 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
April Nicole Russo
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Robbie Dionte Outterbridge (1)
Terminated: 04/21/2025


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 5:23 AM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee Robbie Dionte Outterbridge. Received copies of judgment and docket sheet from Western District of Virginia. (jlan)
Related: [-]