California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00108
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Antoine Andrew Videau (1)
Represented By
Taylor R. Fatherree
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Candis Lea Mitchell
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin James Barry
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 2:05 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Antoine Andrew Videau (1). (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70392-MAG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Initial Appearance as to Antoine Andrew Videau held on 4/7/2025 The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. , Added attorney Candis Lea Mitchell for Antoine Andrew Videau. Detention Hearing set for 4/11/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Status Conference set for 4/11/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Matter referred to Pretrial Service for full bail study.Recording Time 11:01 - 11:07. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70392-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/7/2025 as to Antoine Andrew Videau. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70392-MAG]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney as to Antoine Andrew Videau (Fatherree, Taylor) [3:25-mj-70392-MAG]
Related: [-]
7 7 Stipulated Order Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Antoine Andrew Videau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 4/11/2025. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70392-MAG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Status Conference as to Antoine Andrew Videau held on 4/11/2025 Detention Hearing set for 5/8/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Status Conference set for 5/8/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Gov't to produce discovery.Recording Time 11:11 - 11:14. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:25-mj-70392-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 INDICTMENT as to Antoine Andrew Videau (1) count(s) 1. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet