California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01303
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Terminated:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:25 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1)
Terminated: 04/23/2025
Represented By
Mayra Lopez
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info

GPO Apr 23 2025
JUDGMENT as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced to one year unsupervised probation. No fine. $10.00 S/A waived. Appeal rights waived.; Count(s) 2, Government oral motion to dismiss underlying count is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (rxc)

Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 2:27 AM PDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Arrest of Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (no document attached) (cxl) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez.(cxl) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez: Initial Appearance set for 4/4/2025 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Hunter V. Norton appearing for USA. (Norton, Hunter)Attorney Hunter V. Norton added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez held on 4/4/2025. Defendant present. Oral proffer confirmed. Federal Defenders appointed. Defendant requires Huichol interpreter. Matter continued. The Court orders time excluded; Excludable(s) started as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez: XT1 - Continuance granted, failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice 4/4/25-4/8/25. Judge update in case as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres added to the case. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25MJ1567-VET ( Initial Appearance set for 4/8/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) (CD# 4/4/2025 MDD 25-1:2:22-2:55). (Plaintiff Attorney Elizabet Brown, Joel Doolin AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Isabella Argueta, Cassidy Heverling FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/4/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mayra Lopez appearing for Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (Lopez, Mayra)Attorney Mayra Lopez added to party Felipe Chino-Gonzalez(pty:dft) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (Lopez, Mayra) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 ***Huichol Interpreter needed as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (no document attached) (ecf) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
9 9 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez: Initial Appearance set for 4/8/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (ecf) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez held on 4/8/2025. Defendant not appearing. Rule 5 objection noted. ( Initial Appearance set for 4/9/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) (CD# 4/8/2025 DDL 25-1:3:59-4:02). (Plaintiff Attorney Tyler Bramlet AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Ryan De La Rosa FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
11 11 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez: Initial Appearance set for 4/9/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (cxl) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez held on 4/9/2025. The Court confirms the appointment of counsel. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/25 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 5/01/25 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) Detention Hearing as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez held on 4/9/2025. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Bond set as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1) No Bail. Judge update in case as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner added. Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 25MJ1567-DDL.(Interpreter Rodolfo Martinez, Herminio Ramirez Diaz). (CD# 4/9/2025 DDL 25-1:2:10-2:40). (Plaintiff Attorney Tyler Bramlet AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Emily Child, Carmen Rivera FD-S/A). (aje) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/9/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/9/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
15 15 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (TIME ONLY) as to Defendant Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. On the Court's own motion, Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (mme) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (TIME ONLY) as to Defendant Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. At the request of defense counsel and with the availability of an interpreter: Arraignment on Information / Change of Plea Hearing / Sentence without PSR set for 4/22/2025 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (mme) [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Norton, Hunter) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Plea Agreement by USA (Norton, Hunter) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01567-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 INFORMATION as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (tkl)
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Arraignment on Information as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/22/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court., Change of Plea Hearing as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez held on 4/22/2025. Plea entered by Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1) Guilty Count 1. PSR Waived. All pending motions withdrawn; Pending hearing dates vacated. Plea agreement filed. Sentence Without PSR Hearing held on 4/22/2025 for Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced to one year unsupervised probation. No fine. $10.00 S/A waived. Appeal rights waived. Count(s) 2, Government oral motion to dismiss underlying count is granted. Abstract issued. Judge update in case as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner added to the case. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25cr1303-DDL. (Interpreter Indra Zuno-Pantoja, Herminio Ramirez-Diaz). (CD# 4/22/2025 DDL 10:45-11:30). (Plaintiff Attorney Edward Chang, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Mayra Lopez, FD). (mme)
Related: [-]
21 21 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Felipe Chino-Gonzalez. (exs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Read Receipt
22 22 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Felipe Chino-Gonzalez (rxc)
Related: [-]