California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01295
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Jiovanna Crystell Leon (1)
Represented By
John Francis Kelly
Law Offices Of John F Kelly
contact info
Lewis Christian Muller
Lewis C Muller Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 2:40 AM PDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
Arrest of Jiovanna Crystell Leon (no document attached) (cxl) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon.(cxl) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon: Initial Appearance set for 4/1/2025 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon held on 4/1/2025. Appointed Attorney Lewis Christian Muller(n/a) for Jiovanna Crystell Leon. Bond set as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon (1) $14,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and $1,000 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 4/15/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 4/24/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.) Judge update in case as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon. Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu added to the case. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25MJ1504-SBC (Interpreter Rodolfo Martinez). (CD# 4/1/2025 MDD 25-1:2:03-2:05;2:20-2:26). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Christian Mesa FD-S/A). (aje) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jiovanna Crystell Leon (ave) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jiovanna Crystell Leon (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and $1,000 cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/1/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/1/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Jiovanna Crystell Leon (Muller, Lewis) (axi). [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon set for 4/15/2025 vacated re9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1. (no document attached) (dls) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Complaint by USA as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon. (Rogge, Allison) (dim). [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 ORDER Dismissing Count 2 of the Complaint without prejudice as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/4/2025. (dls) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (DATE ONLY) as to Defendant Jiovanna Crystell Leon. On the Court's own motion, Arraignment RESET for 4/22/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (dls) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 P/S Bond Filed as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon in amount of $10,000, Receipt # 160108. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 4/11/2025. (Document applicable to USA, Jiovanna Crystell Leon.) (dls) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
15 15 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Jiovanna Crystell Leon re14 Bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 4/11/2025. (dls) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon. Report prepared by: C. Ramirez. (Document applicable to USA, Jiovanna Crystell Leon.) (Ramirez, C.) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Rogge, Allison) (axi). [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
18 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney John F. Kelly by Jiovanna Crystell Leon. (Kelly, John) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 MINUTE ORDER Granting18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Court confirms the substitution of Attorney John F. Kelly for Jiovanna Crystell and relieves Attorney Lewis Muller in case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 4/21/2025.(no document attached) (dls) [3:25-mj-01504-SBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 INFORMATION as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon (1) count(s) 1. (dls)
Related: [-]
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment on Information as to Jiovanna Crystell Leon (1) Count 1 held on 4/22/2025. Defendant present on bond; Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/8/2025 10:45 AM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 4/22/2025 SBC 132-137). (Plaintiff Attorney Jacqueline Jimenez, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney John Kelly, RET). (dls)
Related: [-]