Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01481
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 2:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Yeison Rodolfo Chajchalac-Ajanel (1)
Represented By
Michael J Bagley
The Bagley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 4:39 AM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
Arrest of Yeison Rodolfo Chajchalac-Ajanel (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Yeison Rodolfo Chajchalac-Ajanel. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Yeison Rodolfo Chajchalac-Ajanel. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Yeison Rodolfo Chajchalac-Ajanel. (drda)
Related: [-]