Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01492
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 2:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Francisco Antonio Cortez (1)
Represented By
Robert Garza
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 4:44 AM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
Arrest of Francisco Antonio Cortez (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Francisco Antonio Cortez. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Francisco Antonio Cortez. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Francisco Antonio Cortez. (drda)
Related: [-]