Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00066
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Albert Alaniz Barrientes (1)
Represented By
Corey Endo
Federal Public Defender'S Office (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Todd Greenberg
Us Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 3:32 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 FELONY INFORMATION as to Albert Alaniz Barrientes (1) count 1. Arraignment and Plea Hearing set for 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
Related: [-]