California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:25-cv-03531
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 8:02 PM PDT
Defendant
InsuranceZebra, Inc.
Plaintiff
Stacy Penning
Represented By
Emily Ayres Horne
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 8:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 04/29 7:34 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 5:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stacy Penning.. (Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 04/23 12:15 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2025, 01:30 PM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to InsuranceZebra, Inc. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/23 9:33 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2025. (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT (with Jury Demand) against InsuranceZebra, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20595887.). Filed by Stacy Penning.(Fraietta, Philip) Modified on 4/23/2025 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet