California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:25-cv-03581
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
San Francisco Unified School District
Plaintiff
Tracinda Frank
Represented By
William Gordon Kaupp
Kaupp & Feinberg, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/24 10:41 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2025, 02:00 PM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to San Francisco Unified School District. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/24 9:48 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/8/2025. (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/23 7:11 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kaupp, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 7:09 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20602196.). Filed by Tracinda Frank.(Kaupp, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet