California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-03497
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Hayward Hall of Justice, 25CV114496
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates
Represented By
David J. Kaminski
Carlson & Messer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Plaintiff
Dioma Burks
Represented By
Todd M. Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 11:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates. (Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 9:42 AM
NOTICE by Dioma Burks as to Trans Union LLC only (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 04/28 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Calvin Williams Davis on behalf of K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates (Davis, Calvin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 04/23 1:46 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/23 11:49 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 Civil Cover Sheet by K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates . (Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet Filed. Please see version 12/2024 at www.cand.uscourts.gov.No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates (Kaminski, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hayward Hall of Justice. Their case number is 25CV114496. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20591614). Filed by K.B.R., Inc. d/b/a Rash Curtis & Associates. (Kaminski, David) Modified on 4/23/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet