California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-03528
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Shavon Butler
Plaintiff
Oak Tree Property Group
Represented By
Mark B. Chernev
Zacks Freedman & Patterson, PC
contact info
Lisa Karen Padilla
Zacks, Freedman & Patterson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 04/28 10:20 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byShavon Butler. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 6 MOTION to Remand
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 motion Ex Parte Application Thu 04/24 10:44 AM
Ex Parte Application re6 MOTION to Remand on Shortened Time filed by Oak Tree Property Group.(Chernev, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Shortening Time,
Att: 6 Certificate/Proof of Service
6 6 motion Remand Thu 04/24 10:41 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by Oak Tree Property Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 5/8/2025. Replies due by 5/15/2025.(Chernev, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement MPA in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mark Chernev in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Wed 04/23 2:11 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 25-cv-3344-SI. Signed by Judge Kandis A Westmore on 4/23/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/23 11:37 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shavon Butler. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 04/23 11:35 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 11:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shavon Butler. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Alameda (Hayward). Their case number is 25-112467. (). Filed by Shavon Butler. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2025.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet