Original Case: 1:21-cv-02859

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01670
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 7:43 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
ZAYO GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Tess Hand-Bender
DAVIS GRAHAM & STUBBS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MILENIUM INC.
Represented By
Georgianna Q. Tutwiler
HUME SMITH GEDDES GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CROSSROADS COMMUNICATIONS SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
B. Scott Jones
REMINGER CO., LPA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BSM GROUPS, LLC
Defendant - Appellee
JDH CONTRACTING, INC.
Represented By
Thomas A. Pastore
THOMAS PASTORE, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
OCM ENGINEERING, LLC.
Represented By
John W. Mervilde
SCHULTZ & POGUE LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SPECTRUM ENGINEERING, LLC
Represented By
Scott H. Sirich
PLUNKETT COONEY, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TESCO COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Paul Julius Cummings
HENN HAWORTH CUMMINGS LAW FIRM
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By
Robert Dean MacGill
MACGILL PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 4:03 AM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant CSX Transportation, Inc. by 04/28/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/05/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/02/2025 for CSX Transportation, Inc. [1] [7448004] 25-1670 (HTP) [Entered: 04/22/2025 10:15 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 119 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: On Point Construction Management, Inc. and PLB Engineering, LLC. [2] [7448012] 25-1670 (HTP) [Entered: 04/22/2025 10:21 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7448016] JXK [3] [7448016] 25-1670 (HTP) [Entered: 04/22/2025 10:24 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 No attorney(s) added for Appellee BSM Groups, LLC, per District Court docket. [4] [7448018] 25-1670 (HTP) [Entered: 04/22/2025 10:27 AM]
Related: [-]