Original Case: 4:21-cv-00237

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-usc-11313
Typeu.s. civil / u.s. defendant - non plra
Nature of Suit865 Social Security - RSI (405(g))
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, COMMISSIONER
Represented By
Elizabeth Holt
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Michael B. Billingsley
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Timothy Clark
SSA-Ogc
contact info
U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA CHILDRESS
Represented By
Jason P. Bailey
Jason P. Bailey, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 4:19 AM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Joshua Childress on 04/18/2025. Fee Status: IFP Pending. USDC motion pending: Motion for IFP, DE#34 filed on 04/18/2025. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/20/2025 as to Appellee Social Security Administration, Commissioner. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/12/2025 as to Appellant Joshua Childress.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 13 pgs 25-11313 DC Memo Opinion doc#31
Att: 4 1 pgs 25-11313 DC Judgment doc#32