Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 5:25-bk-50105
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
ATXLUB, LLC
3416 Avenue A
Lubbock, TX 79404-2434
Represented By
Max Ralph Tarbox
Tarbox Law, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 04/28 1:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Courtney Jane Hull filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division. (Hull, Courtney)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 04/28 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alysia Cordova filed by Creditor Lubbock Central Appraisal District. (Cordova, Alysia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 04/25 3:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John Kendrick Turner filed by Creditor Tarrant County. (Turner, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Fri 04/25 10:05 AM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Behrooz P. Vida -SBRA V added to the case.(Kippes, Meredyth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Vida Verified Statement
Att: 2 Matrix
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 court Notice of deficiency Thu 04/24 3:31 PM
Notice of deficiency. Cash Flow Statement due 5/1/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 5/1/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Operations due 5/1/2025. (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order regarding SubChapter V Case Thu 04/24 1:40 PM
Scheduling Order regarding SubChapter V Case Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 6/18/2025 at 02:30 PM Lubbock Judge Odell Ctrm. Pre-Status Report Due By 6/4/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 7/23/2025. Entered on 4/24/2025 (Wimberley, Shelby)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11) filed by Debtor ATXLUB, LLC
6 6 4 pgs motion Employ Thu 04/24 9:34 AM
Application to employ Max R. Tarbox as Attorney Filed by Debtor ATXLUB, LLC (Tarbox, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Matrix
5 5 misc Statement of operations Thu 04/24 9:06 AM
Statement of operations for small business. Filed by Debtor ATXLUB, LLC. (Tarbox, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Balance Sheet
Att: 2 Statement of Operations
Att: 3 Cash Flows
Att: 4 Federal Income Tax Return
3 3 misc Support/supplemental document Thu 04/24 8:52 AM
Support/supplemental document Resolution of Board of Directors filed by Debtor ATXLUB, LLC Related [+]. (Tarbox, Max)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
2 2 misc Support/supplemental document Thu 04/24 8:50 AM
Support/supplemental document filed by Debtor ATXLUB, LLC Related [+]. (Tarbox, Max)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
1 1 51 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Thu 04/24 8:34 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Small Business,SubChapter V Filed by ATXLUB, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/23/2025. (Tarbox, Max)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 04/24 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 25-50105 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A32451311, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1