Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:25-cv-00096
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Chatham County, STCV25-00882
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 11:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Angel Williams-Prioleau
Represented By
Joseph D. Perrotta
Cipriani & Werner, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Torres


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 9:43 AM
NOTICE by Joseph Torres of Offer to Settle Tort Claims (Ilardi, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/24 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Counsel is not admitted to practice in this Court. After 14 days of noncompliance, a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (amd) Compliance due by 5/8/2025. Link Added. Modified on 4/24/2025 (thb)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Rule 26(f) Order Thu 04/24 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. ([LINK:Click Here to View Standing Order)] RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/24/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/24 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. After 14 days of noncompliance, a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (amd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 9:29 AM
REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (amd)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/24 9:41 AM
Set Deadlines re1 Notice of Removal,2 Removal Notice, and3 Notice of Deficiency: Angel Williams-Prioleau answer due 5/1/2025. Compliance due by 5/8/2025. Motions due by 5/8/2025. (amd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms) Thu 04/24 12:03 PM
Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (amd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Angel Williams-Prioleau from the Superior Court of Chatham County, case number STCV25-00882. (Filing fee $405.00 receipt number CGASDC-4048451)(amd) (amd). Modified on 4/24/2025 to add unredacted exhibit(amd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 (4/24/2025) Exhibit E