New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:25-cv-03389
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 11:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Memac Ogilvy & Mather LLC
Defendant
Ogilvy Group, LLC
Defendant
Ogilvy Public Relations Worldwide LLC
Defendant
Omnicom Group, Inc.
Defendant
Portland PR, Inc.
Plaintiff
A. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
An. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ar. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
V. A.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
F. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. N. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jo. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rog. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rom. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
V. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
W. B.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Al. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
C. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. D. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
En. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. D. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
N. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
P. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Re. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ri. C.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
An. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
B. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ra. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Re. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ro. D.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
I. E.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. E.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. B. E.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. F.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. F.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. J. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
L. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ra. G.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. I.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
D. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. D. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G. D. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
L. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. D. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ra. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ro. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
T. L.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
B. M.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
E. M.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
V. M.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
L. N.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. N.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
S. N.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G. O.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. O.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ri. O.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rod. O.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron. O.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Am. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
L. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rh. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ro. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rol. P.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ari. R.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arn. R.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
D. D. R.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. R.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
C. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
F. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. S.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
B. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ed. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Er. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
F. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
G. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ji. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. T.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
A. V.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
C. V.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
H. V.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
L. V.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. V.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ra. V.
Represented By
Adam Joshua Goldstein
Sparacino PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Mon 04/28 12:30 PM
***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Plaintiffs re:16 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, . Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:16 .(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 04/25 4:58 PM
ORDER temporarily granting9 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The motion is GRANTED but only temporarily. Defendants - and any non-party who seeks, and is granted, leave to intervene for purposes of being heard on the issue shall file any opposition to the motion within two weeks of Defendants' entering a notice of appearance; any reply shall be filed within one week of any opposition. In the meantime, the Court reserves judgment on whether to grant the motion on a more permanent basis. To ensure that the Court has no conflicts that would require recusal, Plaintiffs shall promptly file, under seal, a declaration disclosing Plaintiffs' identities to the Court. To ensure that Plaintiffs' names do not appear on the public docket, Plaintiffs' counsel should ensure that the declaration is titled "Declaration of Plaintiffs."SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/25/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 04/25 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 31, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. When prompted for an attendee ID number, press the pound (#) key again. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 conference. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 3.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 7/31/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/25/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Omnicom Group, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Memac Ogilvy & Mather LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ogilvy Group, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Portland PR, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 3:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ogilvy Public Relations Worldwide LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/25 1:57 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/25 1:58 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/25 1:58 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/24 1:00 PM
EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Anonymously, with Memorandum in Support . Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 12:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Memac Ogilvy & Mather LLC, re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 12:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ogilvy Public Relations Worldwide LLC, re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 12:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ogilvy Group LLC, re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 12:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Portland PR, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 12:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Omnicom Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eli Johnson Kay-Oliphant on behalf of A. A., An. A., Ar. A., E. A., G. A., J. A., M. A., R. A., V. A., A. B., F. B., J. B., J. N. B., Jo. B., R. B., Rog. B., Rom. B., V. B., W. B., Al. C., C. C., E. D. C., E. C., En. C., J. C., J. D. C., N. C., P. C., R. C., Re. C., Ri. C., A. D., An. D., B. D., R. D., Ra. D., Re. D., Ro. D., I. E., R. B. E., R. E., J. F., R. F., A. G., E. G., G. G., J. J. G., L. G., M. G., Ra. G., R. I., D. L., E. D. L., E. L., G. D. L., J. L., L. L., M. D. L., R. L., Ra. L., Ro. L., T. L., B. M., E. M., V. M., L. N., R. N., S. N., G. O., J. O., Ri. O., Rod. O., Ron. O., A. P., Am. P., J. P., L. P., R. P., Rh. P., Ro. P., Rol. P., Ari. R., Arn. R., D. D. R., M. R., A. S., C. S., F. S., G. S., J. S., M. S., R. S., B. T., Ed. T., Er. T., F. T., G. T., J. T., Ji. T., R. T., A. V., C. V., H. V., L. V., R. V., Ra. V...(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 12:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kay-Oliphant, Eli)
Related: [-]
1 1 145 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Memac Ogilvy & Mather LLC, Ogilvy Group, LLC, Ogilvy Public Relations Worldwide LLC, Omnicom Group, Inc., Portland PR, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30979300)Document filed by Er. T., F. B., D. D. R., Rh. P., M. A., R. B., A. V., T. L., R. P., E. D. L., Rom. B., C. C., R. B. E., B. M., J. A., J. T., E. G., Ra. D., R. D., Ro. P., Jo. B., L. P., C. V., Ri. O., V. A., Re. D., An. A., En. C., F. T., An. D., Ri. C., R. L., J. F., Ra. V., R. I., Ro. D., W. B., E. M., M. G., J. L., G. O., M. D. L., Rog. B., G. T., L. G., Ar. A., B. D., R. S., J. O., L. N., Ji. T., M. R., S. N., J. B., R. C., C. S., Ra. L., R. F., L. V., J. S., M. S., R. A., N. C., B. T., A. B., A. A., Re. C., Ed. T., Ron. O., R. T., E. D. C., E. L., R. V., G. S., R. E., Arn. R., P. C., L. L., J. J. G., E. C., V. B., J. P., R. N., H. V., D. L., J. C., Ari. R., E. A., Rod. O., V. M., A. S., Ra. G., A. D., G. A., Ro. L., Am. P., J. N. B., J. D. C., Al. C., G. G., Rol. P., A. G., F. S., G. D. L., I. E., A. P...(Goldstein, Adam)
Related: [-]