New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:25-cv-03393
Nature of Suit865 Social Security - RSI (405(g))
Cause42:405 Rev. of Final Dec. of Sec. of HEW re: S.S. Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heetano Shamsoondar on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Shamsoondar, Heetano)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/25 11:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/25 11:28 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/25 11:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action Fri 04/25 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 6/24/2025..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 10:43 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burko, Louis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security Of The United States. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30979473)Document filed by Abdul Richardson..(Burko, Louis)
Related: [-]