Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Referred: Carmen E Henderson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00825
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 04/28 8:48 AM
Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Justin M. Goldstein for Jose Echevarria. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 4/28/2025.(M,Do)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 9:42 PM
Motion for attorney Justin Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-13067824, filed by Plaintiff Jose Echevarria.(Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
6 6 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Thu 04/24 2:53 PM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Magistrate Judges Initial Order Thu 04/24 2:53 PM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 4/24/2025. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Thu 04/24 2:51 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Related [+]. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 4/24/2025.(M,Do)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 order Administrative Track DCM Initial Order Thu 04/24 10:17 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi on 4/24/2025. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/24 9:54 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jose Echevarria. (Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 9:54 AM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Jose Echevarria. (Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Unfavorable Decision,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 04/24 10:15 AM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 04/24 10:16 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Social Security Complaint Thu 04/24 10:16 AM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
order Automatic Reference of Administrative Action Thu 04/24 10:24 AM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/24/2025. (K,AR)
Related: [-]