South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 3:25-cv-03401
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Case in other court:North Carolina Eastern, 5:24-cv-00669
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 11:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Wayne
Defendant
Robert George Wayne, Jr.
Plaintiff
Rockingham Community Christian Church
PO Box 713
Rockingham, NC 28380
Plaintiff
Felicia Sawyer
PO Box 713
Rockingham, NC 28380
Plaintiff
Alonzo Sutton
PO Box 713
Rockingham, NC 28380


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 04/24 9:09 AM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:24-cv-00669. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 ORDER - The Court DIRECTS the clerk to transfer this action to the District of South Carolina pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), and to send a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiffs and to the Clerk of Court for the District of South Carolina. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/22/2025. Copy sent via US Mail to Rockingham Community Christian Church, Felicia Sawyer, and Alonzo Sutton at PO Box 713, Rockingham, NC 28380. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding8 MOTION Request for US Marshals to Serve Subpoenas. (Edwards, S.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 MOTION - Request for US Marshals to Serve Subpoenas filed by Felicia Sawyer. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 Notice - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Felicia Sawyer. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 ORDER - Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/14/2025. Copy sent via US Mail to Felicia Sawyer and Alonzo Sutton to PO Box 713, Rockingham, NC 28380. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 Letter from Felicia Sawyer informing the Court Alonzo Sutton is deceased. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice - Proposed Summons filed by Felicia Sawyer. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Felicia Sawyer. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
3 3 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Felicia Sawyer (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Rockingham Community Christian Church, Felicia Sawyer, Alonzo Sutton. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against Robert George Wayne, Jr., Robert Wayne (Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number 5-00013908), filed by Rockingham Community Christian Church, Alonzo Sutton, Felicia Sawyer. (Rudd, D.)\ [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/24/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Liability Notice of Occurrence / Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit Photographs,
Att: 3 Envelope