California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Case #: 5:25-cv-03589
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:25-cv-00360
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 11:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Juniper Networks Inc
Represented By
Jennifer Seraphine
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Traxcell Technologies II, LLC
Represented By
David John Hoffman
Law Office David J. Hoffman
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/29 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Victoria Moffa on behalf of Juniper Networks Inc (Moffa, Victoria)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/29 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Megan Rae Whyman Olesek on behalf of Juniper Networks Inc (Olesek, Megan Rae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 04/24 11:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEADLINE. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2025 pursuant to Judge Wise's standing order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/24 10:58 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2025 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 04/24 10:41 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:25-cv-00360. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER granting13 Letter Motion to Stay Having considered the Motion, the Court is of the opinion that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the above-captioned case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and all deadlines in this action are stayed pending transfer. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to transfer the instant case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California and close the file in this case. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/16/2025) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 04/24 8:30 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California.(rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 2 pgs JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay re:1 Complaint / Request for Transfer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jennifer Seraphine and David J. Hoffman dated April 15, 2025. Document filed by Juniper Networks, Inc...(Seraphine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 1 pgs ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's request for an extension to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendant is directed to respond to the complaint by April 25, 2025. SO ORDERED. Juniper Networks, Inc. answer due 4/25/2025. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/20/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint for Patent Infringement addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jennifer Seraphine dated February 20, 2025. Document filed by Juniper Networks, Inc...(Seraphine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
10 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Juniper Networks, Inc.. Document filed by Juniper Networks, Inc...(Seraphine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Seraphine on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc...(Seraphine, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 2/5/2025, answer due 2/26/2025. Service was accepted by ROBIN HUTT BANKS. Document filed by Traxcell Technologies II, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juniper Networks, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
Related: [-]
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David John Hoffman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
5 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Traxcell Technologies II, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Juniper Networks, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Traxcell Technologies II, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hoffman, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT against Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30458166)Document filed by Traxcell Technologies II, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B