Oregon District Court
Judge:Mark D Clarke
Case #: 1:25-cv-00669
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 11:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Nationwide Capital Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Nykole S. Feasel
Represented By
Kyle W. Schumacher
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 2:25 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Nationwide Capital Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (hm)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 2:25 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (hm)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 1 - Scheduling Thu 04/24 2:10 PM
Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order,2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 9/22/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 04/24 1:54 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/22/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/22/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 9/22/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 7:21 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9825925 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nykole S. Feasel against All Defendants. (Schumacher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons