Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hilary L Barnes
Case #: 3:25-bk-50375
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 02, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jul 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
LA TANA LLC
1179 Fairview Dr Ste 100
Carson City, NV 89701-5424
Represented By
KEVIN A. DARBY
Darby Law Practice, Ltd
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - RN
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
15 15 batch Creditor Request for Notice (Batch) (Creditors) Thu 05/01 7:00 AM
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by BELAIR, KAREN on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK with Certificate of Service (BELAIR, KAREN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 misc Balance Sheet Mon 04/28 3:23 PM
Balance Sheet , Statement of Operations for Small Business , Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LA TANA LLC (DARBY, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Tax Documents Mon 04/28 3:20 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2024 . This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LA TANA LLC (DARBY, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
utility Add Trustee Mon 04/28 8:19 AM
NATHAN F. SMITH added to case, Terminated Trustee CHAPTER 11 - RN (mmm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 04/27 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Set Hearing.
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 04/27 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Individual (BNC)
Saturday, April 26, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/26 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (BNC)
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 10:42 AM
Certificate of Service Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11 Related [+] (DIDION, TERRI)
Related: [-] 6 Appointment of Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
8 8 court Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Individual (BNC) Fri 04/25 10:17 AM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. (mmm)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Set Hearing (BK) Fri 04/25 9:24 AM
Order to Set Hearing. Status Hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Pre-Status Report Due By 5/20/2025. Related [+] (nac)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor LA TANA LLC.
6 6 trustee Appointment of Trustee Fri 04/25 7:45 AM
Appointment of Trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (DIDION, TERRI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Thu 04/24 3:22 PM
Notice of Appearance AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE Filed by CARLOS R. HERNANDEZ-VIVONI on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11 (HERNANDEZ-VIVONI, CARLOS)
Related: [-]
4 4 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Thu 04/24 11:15 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-50375 ) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number A22347703, fee amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment) Thu 04/24 10:58 AM
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Thu 04/24 10:49 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LA TANA LLC (DARBY, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11 Thu 04/24 10:49 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LA TANA LLC Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/23/2025. (DARBY, KEVIN)
Related: [-]