South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 3:25-cv-03431
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:Richland County Court of Common Pleas, 2025-CP-40-01801
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 2:10 PM EDT
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
John M Montgomery
Robinson Gray Stepp And Laffitte LLC
contact info
Rebecca Laffitte
Robinson Gray Stepp And Laffitte LLC
contact info
Haley Saxby Moorman
Robinson Gray Stepp And Laffitte LLC
contact info
Cordes Baxter Kennedy
Robinson Gray Stepp And Laffitte LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ubong Christopher Ubokudom
P. O. Box 1594
Columbia, SC 29202


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 misc Document Mailed Mon 04/28 3:32 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED9 Order to Notify of Address Change, 10 Order, Local Civil Rule 26.01 form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Ubong Christopher Ubokudom P. O. Box 1594 Columbia, SC 29202. (apsn)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/28 3:31 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Defendant seeks to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, which it removed from state court, on the basis that it does not meet the federal pleading standard under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8, Ashcroft v. Iqbal, 556 U.S. 662 (2009), and Bell Atlantic Corporation v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544 (2007). Alternatively, the Defendant asks the court to order that Plaintiff be required to provide a more definite statement pursuant to Rule 12(e). Of course, when Plaintiff filed his Complaint in state court, he was not required to meet the pleading standards that apply in federal court. Accordingly, the court finds it appropriate and in the interest of judicial economy to allow Plaintiff to amend his Complaint. Plaintiff is hereby GRANTED twenty-one (21) days to file an amended complaint. Defendant's motion (ECF No. 4 ) is hereby DISMISSED from the docket without prejudice to file a motion addressed toward Plaintiff's amended complaint at the appropriate time. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 4/28/2025. (kkus, )
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Notify of Address Change ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/28 3:25 PM
ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. As a pro se litigant, Plaintiff is directed to submit fully completed and signed answers to the court's interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.), which are attached to this order, within twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered (plus three days for mail time). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 4/28/2025. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 misc Document Mailed Thu 04/24 12:14 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED6 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Ubong Christopher Ubokudom P. O. Box 1594 Columbia, SC 29202. (apsn)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 12:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/27/2025, Discovery due by 8/22/2025, Motions due by 9/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 4/24/2025. (apsn)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 11:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Walmart Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/8/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/24 11:47 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walmart Inc.(apsn) (apsn, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/24/2025) Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland Common Pleas, case number 2025-CP 40-01801 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12412497), filed by Walmart Inc.(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service