California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:25-cv-03582
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 12:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff
Theary Ngin
Represented By
Joseph Brian Angelo
Gale, Angelo, & Johnson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/24 1:25 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2025, 02:00 PM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 1:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/24 11:10 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/8/2025. (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 04/24 7:15 AM
Proposed Summons. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 7:14 AM
COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20602472.). Filed by Theary Ngin.(Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet