New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:25-cv-03401
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1346 U.S. Defendant
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Acting Director Todd M. Lyons
U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement 500 12th St. SW
Washington, DC 20536
Defendant
Secretary Kristi Noem
Department of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr Ave SE
Washington, DC, DC 20528
Plaintiff
Junyang Zhao
685 1st Ave Apt 37B
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Sandy Hom
Wei Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 04/29 4:39 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by June 30, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/29/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 4:37 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by June 30, 2025, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by June 30, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/29/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 4:33 PM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/29/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/25 10:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/25 10:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/25 10:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 04/25 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sandy Hom. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 04/25 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sandy Hom. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Todd M. Lyons, Kristi Noem. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/25 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sandy Hom to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; incorrect jurisdiction was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/25 10:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sandy Hom to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Todd M. Lyons, Kristi Noem. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30981465)Document filed by Junyang Zhao..(Hom, Sandy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Summons