Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:25-cv-00431
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:Collin County District Court, 429th
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 3:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Clutch Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Michael Besser
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Plaintiff
SHI INTERNATIONAL CORP.


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/09 5:55 PM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Corrected Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery19 is set for hearing on 5/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan.). Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/9/2025. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
19 19 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 05/06 9:09 AM
CORRECTED EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery by SHI International Corp..(Alibhai, Jamil) Modified text on 5/6/2025 (rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Affidavit/Declaration Declaration of Megan Thompson,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
misc Notice of Deficiency Mon 05/05 8:51 AM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 18 Motion for TRO, filed by SHI International Corp.. - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
18 18 32 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 05/02 10:12 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SHI International Corp..(Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 6 pgs Proposed Order
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Christopher Clark served on 5/1/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
16 16 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10818172.), filed by SHI International Corp..(Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit 9
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Matthew Monte served on 4/25/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Daniel Clark served on 4/26/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Yaujin "Alex" Yoon served on 4/26/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. William Wortham served on 4/25/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Neil Lella served on 4/28/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Katelyn Keller served on 4/25/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. John Cameron Mulloy served on 4/28/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Beau Walker served on 4/28/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Amza Safi served on 4/28/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 9:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHI International Corp.. Clutch Solutions, LLC served on 4/28/2025. (Alibhai, Jamil)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 3:41 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/25/2025. (xl)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Christopher Clark, Daniel Clark, Clutch Solutions, LLC, Katelyn Keller, Neil Lella, Matthew Monte, John "Cameron" Mulloy, Amza Safi, Beau Walker, William Wortham, Yaujin "Alex" Yoon.(rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 22 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 4:41 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SHI International Corp..(rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit A-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-6,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-7,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-8,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-9,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-10,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit A-11,
Att: 13 3 pgs Exhibit A-12,
Att: 14 3 pgs Exhibit A-13,
Att: 15 3 pgs Exhibit A-14,
Att: 16 4 pgs Exhibit A-15,
Att: 17 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 18 5 pgs Exhibit B-1,
Att: 19 6 pgs Exhibit B-2,
Att: 20 6 pgs Exhibit B-3,
Att: 21 6 pgs Exhibit B-4,
Att: 22 5 pgs Exhibit B-5,
Att: 23 7 pgs Exhibit B-6,
Att: 24 6 pgs Exhibit B-7,
Att: 25 7 pgs Exhibit B-8,
Att: 26 2 pgs Exhibit B-9,
Att: 27 3 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 28 2 pgs Exhibit D
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 04/24 3:06 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by Clutch Solutions, LLC (Besser, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/24 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clutch Solutions, LLC from 429th District Court, case number 429-02924-2025. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10801662), filed by Clutch Solutions, LLC.(Besser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Collin Co. Dist Ct Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - SHI's Original Verified Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - List of Attys in Removed Action,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - List of All parties,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Certificate of Interested Parties,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/24 4:32 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 04/24 4:33 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 04/24 4:34 PM
Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc)
Related: [-]