California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-03605
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 2:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Alta Manufacturing Inc
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Charles M. Duffy
Doj-Tax
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 5:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Alta Manufacturing Inc. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/24 5:26 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/24 1:09 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/8/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 04/24 12:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Duffy, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Alta Manufacturing Inc. Filed by United States of America.(Duffy, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet