Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00757
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 24, 2025 2:10 PM PDT
Defendant
Humana Health Plan Inc
Plaintiff
Providence Health & Services - Washington
Represented By
Arden J Olson
Harrang Long Pc (eugene)
contact info
Kurt C Peterson
Harrang Long Pc (portland)
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Mon 04/28 9:05 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
4 4 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Mon 04/28 9:03 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 9:26 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to Defendant Humana Health Plan Inc. (MIH)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 04/25 9:22 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/25 9:15 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 04/25 9:20 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff Providence Health & Services Washington must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/2/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MIH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Providence Health & Services - Washington with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Providence Health & Services - Washington.(Peterson, Kurt)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8945173
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons